U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ABASS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 14, 2025: [Review]
  • April 13, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 13, 2025: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • April 12, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Temporary Detention ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arrest ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.