U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00887
  • Case Name: ABRAMOWITZ et al v. LAKE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party]
  • March 26, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.