U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-02214
  • Case Name: YODER v. ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.