U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00457
  • Case Name: CENTER FOR TAXPAYER RIGHTS et al v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.