U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00894
  • Case Name: SADEGHI v. GOVERNMENT OF THE ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.