U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02675
  • Case Name: CRAWFORD v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, et.al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.