U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00396
  • Case Name: PATTERSON v. EMMERT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Substitute]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.