U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01742
  • Case Name: ATRIUM HEALTH CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER v. BECERRA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.