U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01817
  • Case Name: ARAMNAHAD et al v. BLINKEN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 30, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.