U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00900
  • Case Name: HARVEY v. SYMONS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 09, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.