U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00907
  • Case Name: RADIO FREE ASIA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.