U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00109-
  • Case Name: LaFortune Real Estate Development LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended List of Creditors/Schedules: Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount/Reclassification]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule C]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Resolution]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims (Original or Amended)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.