U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00878
  • Case Name: YOUNG v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 14, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Not Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.