U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00912
  • Case Name: ROSE v. NATIONAL NUCLEAR SECURITY ADMINISTRATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 03, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.