U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03450
  • Case Name: COLODNEY v. MAYORKAS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • April 02, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.