U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00264
  • Case Name: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 27, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.