U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00909
  • Case Name: SLAUGHTER et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.