U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00645
  • Case Name: MARKOS v. MCWILLIAMS/BALLARD INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.