U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03729
  • Case Name: CONTE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Designate Filing as HSD]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.