U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00915
  • Case Name: SAGEBRUSH HEALTH SERVICES v. KENNEDY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 30, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.