U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00922
  • Case Name: PHEENIX USH LLC v. DISTRICT DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 28, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.