U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03661
  • Case Name: OLUGEBEFOLA et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Vacate]
  • May 07, 2025: [Affidavit]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 24, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 03, 2025: [Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.