U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00917
  • Case Name: WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE AND DORR LLP v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 14, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Modify]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 28, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.