U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00916
  • Case Name: JENNER & BLOCK LLP v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 12, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Permanent Injunction]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 28, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.