U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00928
  • Case Name: LOPEZ v. AZURITY PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Telephone Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • April 04, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.