U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00931
  • Case Name: LOWELL et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Clerk -1608(a)(3) -regist]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request-1608(a)(3) - register]
  • April 11, 2025: [Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.