U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00211
  • Case Name: PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.