U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00561
  • Case Name: ZHANG v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, PRIVACY OFFICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.