U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00935
  • Case Name: NATIONAL TREASURY EMPLOYEES UNION v. DONALD J. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.