U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00851
  • Case Name: SIMMONS v. UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form]
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.