U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01365
  • Case Name: ROSENSON v. BLOOMFIELD
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Error]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.