U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01414
  • Case Name: AMAYA v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.