U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00932
  • Case Name: CHRISTIE et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.