U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01237
  • Case Name: SCURRY v. DAVIS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Errata]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.