U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00130
  • Case Name: IYER v. GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE AND HEALTH SCIENCES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sealed Memorandum Opinion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.