U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00088
  • Case Name: LAWSON v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.