U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00946
  • Case Name: LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS et al v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Modify]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 07, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 04, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 04, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Remark- Consolidation]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.