U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-02212
  • Case Name: VAN DER STELT v. GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.