U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00943
  • Case Name: COALITION FOR HUMANE IMMIGRANT RIGHTS et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Injunction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 31, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.