U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00942
  • Case Name: BARNETT v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.