U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00940
  • Case Name: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.