U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03483
  • Case Name: SAULSBERRY v. GARLAND
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 28, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 28, 2025: [Default Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.