U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00950
  • Case Name: Honor America Capital LLC v. Puech et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.