U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00948
  • Case Name: INCLUSIV, INC. v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 15, 2025: [Create Case Association]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.