U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00982
  • Case Name: US RIGHT TO KNOW v. DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.