U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02476
  • Case Name: SOUTHERN UTAH WILDERNESS ALLIANCE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 08, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Modify]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.