U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00085
  • Case Name: JABEA v. MAYORKAS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.