U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00225
  • Case Name: POWELL v. SODEXO INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Errata]
  • May 01, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.