U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00955
  • Case Name: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS EDUCATION FUND et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Create Case Association]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.