U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00947
  • Case Name: AMERICAN FARM BUREAU FEDERATION et al v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 15, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 01, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.